Trustees BIRCH COPSE SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1078719

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Christine Blackwell | Chair | 02 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emily Elizabeth Hope Mason | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cristina Ana Bodnar | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Ian Grant | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Victoria Mason | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Murray Jay Hughes | Trustee | 15 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michele Joanne Grant | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pardeep Nandra | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Susanne Morris | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maria Louise Maulini | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Brian Bicknell | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Anne Stirk | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Gail Rico | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dean George Stacey | Trustee | 02 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Ruth Lane | Trustee | 02 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.