Trustees THE DOWNTON LINK SCHEME
Charity Number: 1075805

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Matthews | Chair | 10 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Heather Ahern | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Helen Saunders | Trustee | 16 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Alan Peter Nutbeam | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Maureen Briers | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Rogers | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Shepherd | Trustee | 18 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
LINDA CHRISTINE RICKETTS | Trustee | 03 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Peter Stanley Bishop | Trustee | 16 July 2013 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.