Trustees GOSBECK VILLAGE COMMUNITY HALL
Charity number: 1075291

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Toby Mullee | Chair | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Bennett | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Cave | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Hollas | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Marie Nugent | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Prodger | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Prodger | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emily Monaghan | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Coonz | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Annette Jenner | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andy Jenner | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tom Monaghan | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael Howard | Trustee | 20 August 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.