Trustees THE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE MAIDENHEAD
Charity number: 1074907

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Kearney | Chair | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheila White | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jack Kerbel | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Alder | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nuala Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Rose | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Main | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Philip Kenneth Ratcliffe | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.