CHELSEA CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LOG ON TO OUR WEBSITE WWW.CHELSEACHRISTIANCENTRE.ORG.UK TO VIEW OUR ACTIVITIES, OUR BELIEF'S AND THE LEADERSHIP.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bristol City
Governance
- 30 March 1999: Standard registration
- CHELSEA GOSPEL HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT ALAN JONES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MATTHEW COX | Trustee | 12 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN HENRY BURNESS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT MERVYN COX | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.37k | £118.35k | £44.08k | £34.66k | £24.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.66k | £48.84k | £56.39k | £65.43k | £90.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 MARCH 1999 AS AMENDED BY A SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 10 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF DOCTRINES AND PRACTICES SET OUT IN THE SCHEDULE APPENDED, BY SERVING THE COMMUNITY IN A SPIRITUAL AND PRACTICAL WAY, TO FURTHER THE KINGDOM OF HEAVEN UNDER THE GUIDANCE OF GOD THE FATHER, GOD THE SON AND GOD THE HOLY SPIRIT; AND TO BUILD UP THE SPIRITUAL LIFE OF THE BELIEVERS AND ALL WHO ATTEND B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE BRISTOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 BAMPTON CLOSE
EMERSONS GREEN
BRISTOL
BS16 7QZ
- Phone:
- 01179078085
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window