TOGETHER FOR SUDAN - THE BISHOP MUBARAK FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TFS sponsors the education of women and children living in Sudan and South Sudan, including university, technical, vocational, medical & paramedical training. Male children benefit from TFS programmes but not, usually, adult males. Theological education and education outside the two countries are not supported. We seek to expand our geographical reach as funding and other issues permit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- South Sudan
- Sudan
Governance
- 07 June 1999: Standard registration
- 25 February 2014: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 25 February 2014: Funds transferred to 1151145 WOMEN'S EDUCATION PARTNERSHIP
- TFS/BMF (Working name)
- THE BISHOP MUBARAK FUND (Working name)
- THE BISHOP MUBARAK SCHOLARSHIP FUND FOR NUBA WOMEN (Working name)
- TOGETHER FOR SUDAN (Working name)
- TOGETHER FOR SUDAN (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £227.55k | £224.44k | £254.40k | £169.46k | £103.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £232.47k | £222.41k | £195.91k | £152.70k | £106.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 22 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 17 February 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 19 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 27 February 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 30 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 17 March 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 20 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 25 February 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12TH FEBRUARY 1999, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 20TH MAY 1999 AND 27 SEPTEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE OR ASSIST IN RELIEVING PERSONS LIVING IN SUDAN WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF SICKNESS, HARDSHIP, DEPRIVATION OR DISTRESS, IN PARTICULAR BY SUPPORTING ORGANISATIONS AND IMPLEMENTING DEVELOPMENT PROJECTS WHICH RELIEVE NEED AND IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS LIVING IN SUDAN, GIVING PRIORITY TO WOMEN AND CHILDREN AND THOSE FROM THE NUBA MOUNTAINS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: - ADVANCING EDUCATION IN BASIC LITERACY AND OTHER SUBJECTS; - THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING; - THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS TO SUDANESE UNIVERSITIES
Area of benefit
SUDAN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window