THE SUDANESE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION OF SOUTH WALES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDING CULTURAL, RECREATIONAL AND CREATIVE ACTIVITES FOR CHILDREN & YOUNG PEOPLE. RUN CHILDREN'S CROSS CULTURAL AND RCREATIONAL CLASSES AT THE PARADE CENTRE AND INCREASE THE NUMBER ATTENDING. HOLDING A VARIETY OF COMMUNITY EVENTS AND CULTURAL CELEBRATIONS THROUGH OUT THE YEAR.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cardiff
Governance
- 18 April 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam Hassan | Trustee | 22 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sara Khalifa | Trustee | 22 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abdulrahim Ibrahim Ahmad | Trustee | 22 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mudasser Yacoub | Trustee | 22 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Makarim Hamoudi | Trustee | 22 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mahdi Eltahir | Trustee | 22 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Intasar Kabashi | Trustee | 22 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zahra Adam | Trustee | 22 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Safa Mohammed | Trustee | 22 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Arbab | Trustee | 22 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jumma Mansor | Trustee | 22 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
BIRAIR ISMAIL YOUSIF HAMAD | Trustee | 26 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.29k | £26.95k | £18.09k | £7.61k | £14.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.07k | £22.82k | £20.86k | £5.67k | £16.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 02 December 2024 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 03 June 2021 | 338 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 NOVEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED 6 FEBRUARY 2000.
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS AND PRIMARILY THE SUDANESE INHABITANTS IN CARDIFF AND SOUTH WALES (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL OR RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS, THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO: (I) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; AND (II) PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS AND PRIMARILY THE SUDANESE INHABITANTS, IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN COOPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECT
Area of benefit
CARDIFF AND SOUTH WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
3b Pen y Peel Road
Canton
CARDIFF
CF5 1QX
- Phone:
- 07958306582
- Email:
- SUDANCOMMUNWALES@HOTMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
.THESUDANESECOMMUNITYASSOCIATIONOFSOUTHWALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window