MISTLEY MALTINGS TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preservation of Mistley Maltings in Essex and the promotion of its use as community space and for the generation of employment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 19 June 2003: Standard registration
- 16 October 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138 | £74 | £21 | £6 | £32 | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.07k | £65.38k | £5.38k | £382 | £6.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 29 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 27 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 17 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 DECEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25 JANUARY 2001
Charitable objects
TO BENEFIT THE INHABITANTS OF MISTLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE INHABITANTS AND LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO ASSIST IN: 1) THE CONSERVATION, PRESERVATION, RESTORATION, MAINTENANCE, ENHANCEMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF THE FORMER MALTINGS IN MISTLEY AND THEIR GROUNDS AND ENVIRONS FOR THE TIME BEING; 2) ADVANCING EDUCATION; 3) PROMOTING THE ARTS AND PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS
Area of benefit
MISTLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window