THE CHALLENGE FUND - THE FIGHT AGAINST CANCER IN THE EMERGING WORLD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing support to help build capacity for cancer registration, cancer care and research and, the relief of suffering of cancer patients in low- and mid-income countries. For more information please visit www.challengefund.org
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Benin
- Botswana
- Cameroon
- Cape Verde
- Chad
- Congo
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- Gabon
- Ghana
- Guinea
- Ivory Coast
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Mali
- Mauritius
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nepal
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Réunion
- Rwanda
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- South Africa
- Tanzania
- The Gambia
- Uganda
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 31 January 2000: Standard registration
- CHALLENGE FUND (Working name)
- INCTR CHALLENGE FUND (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Sir Walter Fred Bodmer | Chair | 01 March 2008 |
|
|||||||||||||
Dr Anne Makeba | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Charles Mark Lodge | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dr ANNA ZOFIA STEFANIA ROHATINER MD FRCP | Trustee | 01 March 2008 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dr DONALD MAXWELL PARKIN | Trustee | 01 March 2008 |
|
|
||||||||||||
GEOFFREY NIBLETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £108.88k | £318.85k | £220.47k | £339.20k | £185.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £138.49k | £177.38k | £223.22k | £319.10k | £304.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 16 April 2024 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 16 April 2024 | 110 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 12 May 2023 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 12 May 2023 | 135 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 31 December 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 31 December 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED 20 JANUARY 2000 AS AMENDED 2 FEBRUARY 2006 AND 10 DECEMBER 2008.
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM CANCER IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL AT THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DECIDE, AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE UNDERTAKING OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF CANCER PROVIDED THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH ARE PUBLISHED OR OTHERWISE DISSEMINATED 2) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF PUBLIC HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION ABOUT CANCER
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
PRAMA HOUSE
267 BANBURY ROAD
OXFORD
OX2 7HT
- Phone:
- 01865339300
- Email:
- info@challengefund.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window