Financial history MEADOWS YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1076970
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £20.52k £20.35k £17.73k £15.74k £16.53k
Total expenditure £21.62k £19.28k £15.20k £22.48k £16.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0