STAFFORDSHIRE SCHOOLS ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing sporting opportunities for young people throughout the county of Staffordshire to enable them to compete in Track and Field and Cross Country at district, county and national level
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 October 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 19 June 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEREK GRAHAM YEOMANS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Robin Prior | Trustee | 10 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/10/2019 | 01/10/2020 | 01/10/2021 | 01/10/2022 | 01/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.83k | £3.36k | £320 | £14.04k | £16.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.68k | £5.69k | £1.16k | £13.37k | £12.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 October 2023 | 27 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2022 | 02 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2021 | 31 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2020 | 18 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PHYSICAL FITNESS AND DEVELOPMENT, THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF ORGANISED ATHLETICS, AMONGST CHILDREN ATTENDING SCHOOLS AND COLLEGES OF FURTHER EDUCATION WITHIN THE DISTRICTS OF STAFFORDSHIRE AND AS ANCILLARY THERETO: (1) THE ARRANGEMENT OF DISTRICT, INTER-DISTRICT, AND INTER-COUNTY & FIELD, CROSS-COUNTRY, INDOOR AND MULTI - EVENTS COMPETITIONS; (2) PARTICIPATION IN INTER-COUNTY TRACK & FIELD AND CROSS-COUNTRY COMPETITIONS AND IN ALL CHAMPIONSHIPS ORGANISED BY THE ENGLISH SCHOOLS ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION (3) THE ARRANGEMENT OF, OR PARTICIPATION IN SUITABLE, ATHLETICS COACHING COURSES
Area of benefit
DISTRICTS OF STAFFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 NURSERY DRIVE
PENKRIDGE
STAFFORD
ST19 5SJ
- Phone:
- 01543372601
- Email:
- Jmhpurple1@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window