Accounts and annual returns AFRICA RELIEF TRUST (ART)

Charity number: 1077946
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2014 22 May 2015 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2014 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2013 21 July 2014 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2013 14 August 2014 106 days late
Annual return 30 June 2012 09 May 2013 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2012 Not Required