ALDRIDGE MANOR HOUSE YOUTH AND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Walsall
Governance
- 04 June 1999: Standard registration
- 03 May 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £149.99k | £127.64k | £113.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £126.21k | £125.48k | £128.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 27 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 27 November 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 10 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 10 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 10 December 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 10 December 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 FEBRUARY 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ALDRIDGE IN PARTICULAR AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD TOGETHER DEFINED BY WALSALL METROPOLITAN BOROUGH (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJCT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; B) ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS; C)PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION
Area of benefit
ALDRIDGE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window