Accounts and annual returns CWM HARRY LAND TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1100899
Charity reporting is overdue by 745 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 14 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 14 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 379 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 379 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 745 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 745 days
Annual return 30 June 2021 15 September 2023 503 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 15 September 2023 503 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 20 June 2022 416 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 June 2022 416 days late Download Open in new window