Financial history DAME CATHERINE HARPUR'S SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity Number: 1084145
Charity reporting is up to date (80 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/08/2019 01/08/2020 01/08/2021 01/08/2022 01/08/2023
Total gross income £155.59k £169.00k £189.19k £232.94k £295.45k
Total expenditure £147.97k £154.00k £202.12k £234.58k £248.45k
Income from government contracts £21.40k £5.90k £57.00k £33.57k £52.97k
Income from government grants N/A £13.20k £16.00k N/A N/A