Trustees DAME CATHERINE HARPUR'S SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity Number: 1084145
Charity reporting is up to date (80 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Amanda Harmer Chair 23 April 2015
None on record
Fiona Durston Smith Trustee 07 June 2022
None on record
Christina Oppenheimer Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Lorna Harvey Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Sarah Elizabeth Gosling Trustee 27 April 2017
None on record
JOSEPHINE RAINE Trustee 22 May 2013
None on record