AL-BASEERA BRISTOL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefits of the inhabitants of the City of Bristol in particular, but not exclusively, those of somali descent, by associating together the inhabitants and the local authorities, voluntary and other organisations to advance education, welfare and leisure time occupations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
Governance
- 04 July 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDI MOHAMED DJAMA | Chair | 25 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mustafa sharif | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
HASSAN MOHAMED ALI | Trustee | 03 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
ABDIRAHMAN JIBRIL MEAD | Trustee | 03 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
MUSTAFA AHMED | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/05/2020 | 30/05/2021 | 30/05/2022 | 30/05/2023 | 30/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.00k | £72.03k | £61.80k | £87.60k | £111.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.69k | £27.41k | £34.55k | £49.05k | £99.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2023 | 29 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2023 | 29 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2020 | 27 May 2021 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2020 | 27 May 2021 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 8 JUNE 2002.
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CITY OF BRISTOL, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE OF SOMALI DESCENT, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, SOCIAL WELFARE AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS. 2. TO ESTABLISH A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE SUCH A CENTRE FOR THE FURTHERANCE OF ABOVE OBJECTS. 3. OTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
THE INHABITANTS OF THE CITY OF BRISTOL, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE OF SOMALI DESCENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 WADE STREET
ST. JUDES
BRISTOL
BS2 9DR
- Phone:
- 01179413331
- Email:
- info@albaseera.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window