The Queen's Field Trust, Aldeburgh

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintaining the playing field for the benefit of the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 25 March 1999: Standard registration
- ALDEBURGH PLAYING FIELD TRUST (Working name)
- ALDEBURGH PRIMARY SCHOOL PLAYING FIELD TRUST (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR CHRISTOPHER KINGSTON HOWES KCVO CB | Chair |
|
|
|||||
louisa thorp | Trustee | 20 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
PETER ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE JANES MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53 | £25 | £10 | £21 | £28 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27/02/1999 AS AMENDED ON 26/01/2002 as amended on 07 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
ESTABLISHED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUPILS AT ALDEBURGH COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALDEBURGH IN THE COUNTY OF SUFFOLK TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF A PLAYING FIELD AND RECREATION GROUND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE ABOVE MENTIONED PERSONS AND FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
ALDEBURGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
WESTERLY HOUSE
PARK ROAD
ALDEBURGH
SUFFOLK
IP15 5EL
- Phone:
- 01728453826
- Email:
- christopher@howesuk.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window