Accounts and annual returns PENGUIN INTERNATIONAL RUGBY FOOTBALL TRUST

Charity number: 1081047
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 04 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 04 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 04 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 24 February 2022 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required