CENTRE FOR ADHD & AUTISM SUPPORT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CAAS supports, educates and empowers individuals diagnosed with ADHD and/or autism, their families, and the community. Through raising awareness we change perceptions and break down barriers. We provide information, specialist courses and training, support groups and practical help to the ADHD and autism communities in NW London. It now operates and reports as charity 1193799.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £134,090 from 4 government contract(s) and £15,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- HDHD SUPPORT GROUP HARROW (Working name)
- ADHD AND AUTISM SUPPORT HARROW (Previous name)
- ADHD SUPPORT GROUP HARROW (Previous name)
- ADHD SUPPORT HARROW (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £280.29k | £276.56k | £457.17k | £435.35k | £491.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £265.57k | £259.16k | £352.35k | £435.55k | £698.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £50.09k | £58.02k | £71.44k | £134.09k | |
|
Income from government grants | £81.34k | £10.45k | £15.00k | £15.00k | £15.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 19 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 19 December 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/09/1999 AS AMENDED ON 30/03/2000 AS AMENDED ON 15/09/2010 AS AMENDED ON 14/05/2014 AS AMENDED ON 07 JUL 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF INDIVIDUALS WITH ADHD AND/OR AUTISM, THEIR FAMILIES AND THE LOCAL COMMUNITY BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND SUPPORT, THROUGH A RANGE OF COURSES, WORKSHOPS, TRAINING AND YOUTH PROGRAMMES, WHICH AIM TO RAISE AWARENESS, CHANGE PERCEPTIONS AND BREAK DOWN BARRIERS FOR THOSE AFFECTED BY THESE CONDITIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window