Accounts and annual returns NORTH KENT FERAL CAT RESCUE

Charity number: 1077507
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 November 2017 19 August 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 November 2016 12 August 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 November 2016 Not Required
Annual return 05 November 2015 18 August 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 November 2015 Not Required
Annual return 05 November 2014 09 November 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 November 2014 Not Required