Financial history NORTH KENT FERAL CAT RESCUE

Charity number: 1077507
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/11/2013 05/11/2014 05/11/2015 05/11/2016 05/11/2017
Total gross income £6.96k £9.18k £9.32k £6.10k £111
Total expenditure £9.15k £10.15k £9.87k £8.09k £2.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A