AVERT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Founded in 1986 Avert uses digital communications to build health literacy on HIV and sexual health. With over 30 years' experience, we are a trusted provider of accessible, accurate and actionable content and resources that support informed choices. Our work supports global efforts to end AIDS and achieve the Sustainable Development Goal for Health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Lesotho
- Malawi
- Mozambique
- South Africa
- Tanzania
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 25 March 1999: Standard registration
- AIDS EDUCATION AND RESEARCH TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof. SIMON FORREST | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Maxime Cuvellier | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Sherman | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Anna Becker | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carole Leach-Lemens | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW WALKER | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
EMILY VICTORIA HUGHES | Trustee | 25 November 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £236.89k | £205.26k | £1.09m | £429.36k | £361.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £770.14k | £677.37k | £700.26k | £988.08k | £864.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £1.05m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £42.78k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £325 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £610.59k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £89.66k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £5.26k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £82.32k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £10.68k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 FEB 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 NOV 2020 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 OCT 2021
Charitable objects
The objects of the charity are advancement of health worldwide in all areas specific to HIV and related conditions and to address the social determinants. The charity does this by providing activities that will include, but not limited to improving knowledge, awareness, attitudes, practice and ability through informing, educating, motivating and influencing.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Avert
Platf9rm
Tower Point
44 North Road
Brighton
BN1 1YR
- Phone:
- 0044 7745 293728
- Email:
- info@avert.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window