THE PROSPECTS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE ARE A COMMUNITY-LED CHARITY WORKING FOR ENVIRONMENTAL AND SOCIAL IMPROVEMENTS WHICH BENEFIT THE PEOPLE OF HYNDBURN. OUR MISSION IS TO BE THE KEY MOVEMENT IN HYNDBURN FOR ENVIRONMENTAL SUSTAINABILITY AND TO USE OUR COLLECTIVE KNOWLEDGE, SKILLS, WORK AND EXPERIENCE TO SECURE THIS FOR CURRENT AND FUTURE GENERATIONS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £100,702 from 4 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 13 July 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP VINCENT BARWOOD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jeffrey Scales | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Button | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Hopley | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Britcliffe | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Daly | Trustee | 19 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roger Cunliffe | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAUL DAVID WORSWICK | Trustee | 08 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET WORDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR NICK CORT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN HEMINGWAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CATHERINE LORRAINE HOLMES | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £251.89k | £230.53k | £392.00k | £365.76k | £386.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £254.62k | £191.78k | £277.47k | £295.02k | £350.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £1.36k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.15k | £6.75k | £98.10k | £124.36k | £100.70k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 07 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 07 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 23 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 23 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 DECEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 20 SEPTEMBER 2006 AND 21 JULY 2010. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN HYNDBURN SUCH MANNER AS MAY BE CHARITABLE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE FOREGOING:- A. THE ADVANCEMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION OR IMPROVEMENT, INCLUDING: A1) THE CONSERVATION OF FLORA, FAUNA AND THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN HYNDBURN GENERALLY; A2) THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AROUND LOCAL AND GLOBAL SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND BIODIVERSITY; A3) THE PROMOTION OF RECYCLING AND SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT. B. THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT, INCLUDING: B1) THE PROMOTION OF VOLUNTEERING TO IMPROVE THE SKILLS, QUALITIES AND LIFE PROSPECTS FOR RESIDENTS OF HYNDBURN; B2) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY CAPACITY BUILDING IN PURSUANCE OF ENVIRONMENTAL AND SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT PURPOSES; B3) THE PROMOTION OF URBAN AND RURAL REGENERATION IN HYNDBURN, IN RELATION TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR CURRENT AND FUTURE GENERATIONS.
Area of benefit
HYNDBURN
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 BROADWAY
ACCRINGTON
LANCASHIRE
BB5 1EW
- Phone:
- 01254230348
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window