Accounts and annual returns KIWANIS CLUB OF LUTON AND DISTRICT

Charity number: 1076072
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2004 22 August 2005 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2004 Not submitted