Accounts and annual returns CHERNOBYL CHILDREN CANCER CARE CARDIFF (5CS)

Charity number: 1077451
Charity reporting is overdue by 529 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 163 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 163 days
Annual return 31 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 529 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 529 days
Annual return 31 January 2022 04 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 03 December 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 26 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required