BEWSEY/DALLAM COMMUNITY ACTION PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Warrington
Governance
- 13 January 2000: Standard registration
- 21 November 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 OCTOBER 1998 AS AMENDED 19 OCTOBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ECONOMICALLY AND SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF BEWSEY AND DALLAM WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF WARRINGTON INCLUDING THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROMOTION OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND THE ELIMINATION OF UNFAIR DISCRIMINATION ON GROUNDS OF RACE OR SEX AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY AND THE PROMOTION OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH WILL DEVELOP THE SKILLS OF THE INHABITANTS OF BEWSEY AND DALLAM IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY
Area of benefit
THE COMMUNITY OF BEWSEY AND DALLAM WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF WARRINGTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window