THE INTERNATIONAL SPACE SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education through the creation. maintenance and development of facilities for the teaching and exchange of information, data, ideas and experiences concerning space travel and the work of astronauts. The provision of bursaries in the form of assistance with travel, fees and books. The fostering of educational exchanges by pupils and teachers from the UK and overseas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Caerphilly
- Cambridgeshire
- Cardiff
- City Of London
- Croydon
- Cumbria
- Tower Hamlets
- Australia
- India
- United States
Governance
- 25 May 1999: Standard registration
- ISSET (Working name)
- THE INTERNATIONAL SPACE SCHOOL (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Holland Lloyd | Trustee | 26 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Beddoe | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alan Mount | Trustee | 23 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Lloyd | Trustee | 19 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bernard Whittingham | Trustee | 19 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER DAVID BARBER BSC MA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £264.05k | £8.54k | £18.91k | £500 | £3.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £308.48k | £20.53k | £19.27k | £0 | £4.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 10 January 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 MARCH 1999.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR THROUGH 1. .THE CREATION MAINTENANCE AND DEVELOPMENT OF FACILITIES FOR THE TEACHING AND EXCHANGE OF INFORMATION, IDEAS, DATA AND EXPERIENCES CONCERNING SPACE, SPACE TRAVEL, THE WORK OF ASTRONAUTS AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF LIFE IN SPACE AND 2. THE PROVISION OF BURSARIES IN THE FORM OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE WITH TRAVEL, FEES, BOOKS AND OTHER TEACHING RESOURCES FOR SECONDARY SCHOOL PUPILS AND TEACHERS TO STUDY AT RECOGNISED CENTRES OF EXCELLENCE AND TO ATTEND CONFERENCES CONCERNING MATTERS IN 1 ABOVE 3. THE CREATION, MAINTENANCE AND DEVELOPMENT OF AN INTERNET WEB SITE FOR A VIRTUAL LIBRARY OF TEACHING AND LEARNING RESOURCES COVERING ALL SUBJECTS AND THE ESTABLISHMENT OF PUPIL TO PUPIL AND SCHOOL TO SCHOOL COMMUNICATION 4.. THE FOSTERING AND ARRANGEMENT OF EDUCATIONAL EXCHANGES BY PUPILS AND TEACHERS FROM THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS. 2.2.5. THE ARRANGEMENT OF COMPETITIONS AND THE PROVISION OF PRIZES AND AWARDS FOR PUPILS, TEACHERS AND SCHOOLS IN MATTERS RELATED TO 1 ABOVE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
ISSET
CARLTON HOUSE
5 HERBERT TERRACE
PENARTH
SOUTH GLAMORGAN
CF64 2AH
- Phone:
- 02920710295
- Email:
- admin@isset.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window