THE CHEREM DEVELOPMENT PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cherem is a remote village in the Nepal Himalaya. Da Gombu Sherpa was born here and co founded the project that helps develop education, health and well being in the village. Gombu was a great mountaineer. He died of Cancer in Dec 2011. The Leadership of Cherem village lies now with the Cherem Youth Society that Gombu helped to form before his passing established in kathmandu 2068 B.S. 2011.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Conwy
- Nepal
Governance
- 24 August 1999: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBIN ROY HAMER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JOHN DENTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SALLY JANE CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr IAN CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £400 | £400 | £400 | £310 | £430 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 276 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 November 2022 | 641 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 JULY 1999
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF CHEREM, NEPAL, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION
Area of benefit
CHEREM, NEPAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE HOLLIES
GANNOCK PARK
DEGANWY
CONWY
LL31 9PZ
- Phone:
- 01492596959
- Email:
- robin@robinhamer.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window