THE PIONEER SAILING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pioneer CK18, a 1st Class Essex Smack, has been restored by the Trust. The Trust provides sail training and recreational activities to persons who have need of such facilities in the interests of social welfare by reason of their age, youth, disability, infirmity, poverty or social or economic circumstances. Boatbuilder apprenticeships are provided to train young people for future employment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 November 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Mark Ormerod | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Hadlow | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
JAMES ALEXANDER HAMILTON GEARY BA, ACA | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
RUPERT MARKS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £397.48k | £367.71k | £559.90k | £230.43k | £277.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £382.30k | £329.36k | £408.61k | £313.15k | £368.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.99k | £61.72k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £422.60k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £69.94k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £63.80k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £6 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £3.56k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £408.61k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £6.78k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/08/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/06/2014 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17/11/2014
Charitable objects
(A) TO ACQUIRE, RESTORE, MAINTAIN AND PRESERVE IN SAILING CONDITION THE LAST REMAINING 1ST CLASS ESSEX SMACK 'THE PIONEER' (CK18), USING AS FAR AS IS REASONABLY PRACTICAL SIMILAR MATERIALS AND TECHNIQUES TO THOSE USED IN THE VESSEL'S ORIGINAL CONSTRUCTION, IN ORDER TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE NATURE, HISTORY AND OPERATION OF SUCH A VESSEL AND THE SKILLS REQUIRED IN USING AND CONSERVING IT; (B) TO ACQUIRE AND/OR TO RESTORE, TO MAINTAIN OR TO PRESERVE IN SEAWORTHY AND OPERATIONAL CONDITION OTHER HISTORIC VESSELS, USING AS FAR AS IS REASONABLY PRACTICAL SIMILAR MATERIALS AND TECHNIQUES TO THOSE USED IN THE VESSELS? ORIGINAL CONSTRUCTION, IN ORDER TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE NATURE, HISTORY AND OPERATION OF SUCH VESSELS AND THE SKILLS REQUIRED IN USING AND CONSERVING THEM; (C) TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND APPRENTICESHIPS IN PARTICULAR TO THOSE IN NEED OF SUCH TRAINING AND APPRENTICESHIPS BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, IN ORDER TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE BUILDING AND RESTORATION OF BOATS; (D) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF BOATS, BOAT BUILDING AND SAILING BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; (E) TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SAILING AND ROWING; (F) TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES IN SAILING AND ALLIED ACTIVITIES AND IN PARTICULAR TO PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, YOUTH, DISABILITY, INFIRMITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES; AND (G) SUCH OTHER PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 22 November 2006 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
HARKERS YARD
SHIPYARD ESTATE
BRIGHTLINGSEA
CO7 0AR
- Phone:
- 01206303373
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window