THE MATTHEW L. WEBB PRIZE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides small prizes to children at St. James C of E Primary School, Wollaston.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Dudley
Governance
- 16 April 1999: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Diana Farmer | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Emma Kay | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lee Salton-McLaughlin | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linsden Webb | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MSS Sarah Webb | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Penny Webb | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88 | £22 | £144 | £31 | £227 | |
|
Total expenditure | £70 | £0 | £140 | £0 | £140 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 19 July 2021 | 231 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29 JANUARY 1999
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE CHILDREN OF ST JAMES C OF E SCHOOL, WOLLASTON BY THE PROVISION OF AN ANNUAL BOOK PRIZE IN THE NAME OF MATTHEW WEBB PRIZE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 MERIDEN AVENUE
STOURBRIDGE
DY8 4QP
- Phone:
- 01384392218
- Email:
- LINSDEN.WEBB@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window