Accounts and annual returns THE PROMETHEAN TRUST

Charity number: 1078419
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 18 June 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 18 June 2007 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 17 June 2007 137 days late
Annual return 31 March 2005 31 July 2006 181 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required