Financial history THE EDDYSTONE TRUST

Charity number: 1078268
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £922.15k £778.85k £743.10k £672.86k £730.50k
Total expenditure £901.70k £678.90k £787.15k £707.20k £724.59k
Income from government contracts £742.88k £601.97k £545.88k £524.95k £553.39k
Income from government grants N/A £25.00k £25.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.27k £1.64k £21.39k £2.23k £12.61k
Income - Other trading activities £11.87k £3.25k £5.36k £14.77k £8.19k
Income - Charitable activities £794.51k £601.97k £545.88k £524.95k £553.39k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £101.51k £134.99k £160.54k £122.26k £145.84k
Income - Other £10.99k £37.00k £9.93k £8.66k £10.47k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £795.59k £587.79k £550.02k £545.84k £616.89k
Expenditure - Raising funds £106.10k £91.11k £237.13k £161.36k £107.70k
Expenditure - Governance £38.74k £48.18k £52.07k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £91.11k £237.13k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0