4SIGHT VISION SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
4Sight provides about 5000 vision impaired people with information, guidance & on-going support to promote independence & prevent social isolation following sight loss. We help people to access advice, equipment, skills & services needed to improve health & wellbeing, build confidence & participate actively in their community and family life. 4Sight also campaigns to remove barriers to inclusion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £17,085 from 56 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
222 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- Hampshire
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 4SIGHT (Working name)
- W S A B (Working name)
- WEST SUSSEX ASSOCIATION FOR THE BLIND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr NORMAN BOYLAND | Chair |
|
||||||
Carole Wooldridge | Trustee | 25 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Kirkham | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Heather Bell | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sheilagh Baker | Trustee | 28 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
ARTHUR JAMES MAYSON ACIB TEP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £357.45k | £423.24k | £364.72k | £350.10k | £488.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £518.55k | £398.61k | £424.28k | £386.77k | £398.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £24.75k | £61.85k | £31.54k | N/A | £17.09k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 MARCH 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 5 NOVEMBER 2009 . AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 07 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
WEST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
Victoria Drive
Bognor Regis
West Sussex
PO21 2TE
- Phone:
- 01243838006
- Email:
- enquiries@4sight.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window