Financial history CITY CHURCH ( CAMBRIDGE )

Charity number: 1076291
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £608.34k £580.91k £636.38k £549.39k £665.98k
Total expenditure £605.03k £594.53k £652.61k £643.88k £759.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £584.28k £563.87k £617.58k £525.18k £638.50k
Income - Other trading activities £7.20k £2.81k £5.97k £11.69k £11.04k
Income - Charitable activities £14.80k £11.03k £11.39k £12.35k £12.25k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.07k £3.21k £1.45k £180 £4.20k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £605.03k £594.53k £652.61k £643.88k £759.97k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £2.46k £2.46k £2.46k £2.44k £2.15k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0