THE CHARITIES PROPERTY FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE FUND AIMS TO PROVIDE A HIGH AND SECURE LEVEL OF INCOME WITH THE PROSPECT OF GROWTH IN INCOME AND TO MAINTAIN THE CAPITAL VALUE OF ASSETS HELD IN THE FUND, THROUGH INVESTING IN A DIVERSIFIED UK COMMERCIAL PORTFOLIO. THE FUND INVESTS IN THE PRINCIPAL COMMERCIAL PROPERTY SECTORS: OFFICE, RETAIL, INDUSTRIAL AND OTHER (LEISURE, CAR SHOWROOMS). IT DOES NOT INVEST IN SPECULATIVE DEVELOPMENTS.
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 April 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Citibank UK Limited | Trustee | 09 October 2021 |
|
|||||
SAVILLS INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT (UK) LIMITED | Trustee | 06 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 24/06/2020 | 24/06/2021 | 24/06/2022 | 24/06/2023 | 24/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.37m | £60.71m | £58.21m | £63.24m | £78.39m | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.92m | £60.77m | £57.74m | £63.73m | £77.20m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 24/06/2020 | 24/06/2021 | 24/06/2022 | 24/06/2023 | 24/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 24 June 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 24 June 2024 | |||
Annual return | 24 June 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 24 June 2023 | |||
Annual return | 24 June 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 24 June 2022 | |||
Annual return | 24 June 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 24 June 2021 | |||
Annual return | 24 June 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 24 June 2020 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 30 OCTOBER 2009 SCHEME AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 09/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 17/11/2014 AS AMENDED ON 01/01/2016 as amended on 24 Sep 2018 as amended on 20 Jul 2021 as amended on 23 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF A COMMON INVESTMENT FUND FOR THE INVESTMENT OF SUMS OF MONEY AND OTHER PROPERTY FROM TIME TO TIME TRANSFERRED TO THE FUND BY OR ON BEHALF OF A PARTICIPATING CHARITY; PROVIDED THAT THE PARTICIPATING CHARITIES SHALL BE ENTITLED, SUBJECT TO THE PROVISIONS OF THIS SCHEME, TO THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE FUND IN SHARES DETERMINED BY REFERENCE TO THE AMOUNT OR VALUE OF THE MONEYS OR PROPERTY TRANSFERRED TO THE FUND BY OR ON BEHALF OF EACH PARTICIPATING CHARITY AND TO THE VALUE OF THE FUND AT THE TIME OF THE TRANSFERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SAVILLS INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT
33 MARGARET STREET
LONDON
W1G 0JD
- Phone:
- 02031075439
- Email:
- cpfadmin@savillsim.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window