Financial history MAHRAZ DARSHAN DAS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1077990
Charity reporting is overdue by 270 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022
Total gross income £4.05k £26.68k £6.37k £4.52k £5.69k
Total expenditure £7.60k £10.49k £8.01k £5.44k £5.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A