Financial history THE GUISE-MIST MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1076353
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £4.97k £18.59k £24.92k £28.06k £26.57k
Total expenditure £6.02k £16.73k £25.85k £25.06k £27.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A