THE GUISE-MIST MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's main activities is to assist other charitable organisations involved in the welfare of animals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 July 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID ALAN SECCOMBE | Chair |
|
||||||
sarah seccombe | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nichoilas Henry Edmonds | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Edmonds | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM SAMUEL BATH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.97k | £18.59k | £24.92k | £28.06k | £26.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.02k | £16.73k | £25.85k | £25.06k | £27.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23 JUNE 1999
Charitable objects
(1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT (2) IN PARTICULAR IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT (BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) (A) TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF DONKEYS HORSES DOGS AND OTHER DOMESTIC ANIMALS WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION (B) TO PROVIDE OR MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR ANIMAL HOSPITALS OR SANCTUARIES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION AND CARE OF SUCH UNWANTED ANIMALS AND (C) TO PROVIDE TREATMENT FOR SUCH SICK OR ILL-TREATED ANIMALS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 5-6
Weekin Works
112-116 Park Hill Road
Harborne
BIRMINGHAM
B17 9HD
- Phone:
- 0121 382 1000
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window