Trustees THE AQUASPORTS CROSS TRUST
Charity number: 1075300

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sophie-Rose Fanner | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Robinson | Trustee | 11 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAMIAN RANDELL | Trustee | 17 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Diana June Baird | Trustee | 13 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN HELEN BROOKS | Trustee | 29 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
PETER MASON | Trustee | 07 July 2013 |
|
|||||
SUSAN ALBON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.