SEESAW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SeeSaw provides a grief support service for young people in Oxfordshire. We provide tailored support for young people before and after the death of a close family member by: face to face age-appropriate sessions for young people; advice, guidance and support to parents; training, advice, guidance and resources to increase understanding of children's bereavement with a special service for schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £57,000 from 3 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 30 June 1999: Standard registration
- THE BEREAVED CHILDRENS PROJECT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr GILLIAN FORREST | Chair |
|
||||||
Robert Kirtland | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Couldrick | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Chapel | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Shea | Trustee | 17 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Hurst | Trustee | 27 July 2016 |
|
|||||
Glynis Phillips | Trustee |
|
||||||
Kay Symons | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr MARILYN RELF | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £384.94k | £372.90k | £312.37k | £433.52k | £475.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £391.73k | £383.89k | £394.91k | £430.69k | £413.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £55.00k | £55.00k | £35.00k | £46.50k | £57.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 JUNE 1999 AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 7 SEPTEMBER 1999 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION , BY: THE SUPPORT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO HAVE SUFFERED OR ABOUT TO SUFFER A BEREAVEMENT; AND THE PROMOTION OF STUDY AND RESEARCH AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH IN RELATION TO THE EFFECTS OF SUCH LOSS AND INTO METHODS OF SUPPORTING BEREAVED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND EDUCATION IN RELATION TO THOSE EFFECTS AND METHODS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Merewood Avenue
Headington
Oxford
OX3 8EF
- Phone:
- 01865744768
- Email:
- info@seesaw.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window