NATIONAL DAY NURSERIES ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of National Day Nurseries Association is to support the delivery of quality care and early learning for children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,732,415
Donations and legacies | £837 | |
Charitable activities | £2.65m | |
Other trading activities | £3.52k | |
Investments | £81.28k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,335,034
Raising funds | £6.31k | |
Charitable activities | £3.33m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £493,135 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £6.31k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.33m |
People

56 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
44 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 November 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Hill | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nikola Masters | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Anne Dawson | Trustee | 17 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Siddell | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID AMBROSE POULSOM | Trustee | 30 November 2016 |
|
|||||
David Smyllie | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Haywood | Trustee | 05 December 2012 |
|
|||||
COURTENEY ANN DONALDSON | Trustee | 29 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL MOODY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.99m | £2.82m | £3.02m | £2.93m | £2.73m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.99m | £2.58m | £2.80m | £2.88m | £3.34m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £854.55k | £902.22k | £734.47k | £565.25k | £493.14k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £38 | £200.32k | £14.91k | £86.68k | £837 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £11.80k | £15.08k | £3.49k | £7.84k | £3.52k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.96m | £2.59m | £2.99m | £2.82m | £2.65m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £18.41k | £12.90k | £5.28k | £22.15k | £81.28k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.99m | £2.17m | £2.77m | £2.87m | £3.33m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £5.39k | £409.01k | £30.17k | £5.98k | £6.31k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £30.46k | £17.71k | £23.52k | £30.15k | £31.65k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £869.93k | £814.04k | £890.20k | £876.95k | £905.37k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.50m | £2.81m | £2.94m | £2.89m | £2.23m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £836.21k | £842.18k | £796.38k | £669.15k | £639.52k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/03/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/09/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/05/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/02/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/01/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/05/2011 as amended on 19 Jan 2023 as amended on 03 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
2.1 The object of the Charity is to enhance the development and education of children in their early years, through the provision of support services to private voluntary and independent organisations who are delivering education and care to said children and in doing so to develop, encourage and maintain high standards in education and care for the benefit of the children, their family unit and their local community. 2.2 In carrying out its objects the Charity shall promote equality of opportunity for all sections of the community, both in its own affairs and in society generally. 2.3 Nothing in these Articles shall authorise an application of the property of the Charity for purposes which are not charitable in accordance with section 7 of the Charities and Trustee Investment (Scotland) Act 2005.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
National Day Nurseries Association
National Early Years Enterprise Cen
Longbow Close
Bradley
HUDDERSFIELD
HD2 1GQ
- Phone:
- 01484407070
- Email:
- info@ndna.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window