THE CAMBRIDGE WATER CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity makes grants to organisations to help relieve poverty in the Cambridgeshire area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 02 September 1999: Standard registration
- 22 February 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.00k | £3.00k | £3.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.00k | £3.00k | £3.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 24 August 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 24 August 2010 | 297 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 21 November 2008 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 23 April 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 23 April 2007 | 174 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST MARCH 1999
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE SAID INCOME AND ( IF AND SO OFTEN ASTHE TRUSTEES THINK FIT) THE WHOLE OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND AS THEY SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT TO OR FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY THE DISCHARGE OF ACCOUNTS FOR WATER SUBMITTED IN RESPECT OF RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION TO PERSONS WHO CANNOT BY REASON OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISTRESS AFFORD TO PAY SUCH ACCOUNTS TO THE EXTENT THAT SUCH DISCHARGE IS AN EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECT AND PURPOSE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT AND TO MAKE DONATIONS TO OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT NOTHING CONTAINED HEREIN SHALL AUTHORISE AS THE TRUSTEES TO APPLY ANY PART OF THE TRUST FUND OR THE INCOME THEREOF TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY OBJECTS OR PURPOSES AS AFORESAID SAVE THOSE REGARDED AS CHARITABLE BY THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window