BILGA GENERAL HOSPITAL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of Bilga General Hospital is to help provide effective healthcare to a population of well over one hundred thousand in the village of Bilga and the surrounding villages. We also provide free medical treatment to patients living below the poverty line (BPL). The hospital is owned and maintained by the Trust, but is operated by the Christian Medical College and Hospital (CMC), Ludhiana.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sandwell
- India
Governance
- 08 June 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harjinder Singh | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harminder Singh Bahra | Trustee | 28 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
KULBIR SINGH SANGHERA | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr JUGJIT SINGH SANGHERA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.56k | £2.98k | £37.96k | £69.53k | £3.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.63k | £27.11k | £26.82k | £42.86k | £29.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2024 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 May 2023 | 98 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2023 | 417 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 May 2022 | 94 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 April 2021 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 April 2021 | 67 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 MAY 1999
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH EDUCATION, VOCATIONAL TEACHING, AND PREVENTATIVE MEDICINE FOR THE POOR AND OTHER RESIDENTS OF BILGA AND SURROUNDING VILLAGES IN PUNJAB INDIA.
Area of benefit
BILGA AND SURROUNDING VILLAGES IN PUNJAB INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 The Barns
Grange Farm
St. Peters Lane,Bickenhill
SOLIHULL
West Midlands
B92 0ED
- Phone:
- 07850781451
- Email:
- jssbilga@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window