SCARBOROUGH GASTROENTEROLOGY RESEARCH FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity operates predominantly for patients who have a wide range of gastroenterologal diseases including cancer of the colon. Our activities relate predominantly to organising prospective research projects in an attempt to improve outcomes of treatments in these patients.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- CGC RESEARCH FUND (Working name)
- COMBINED GASTROENTEROLOGY CLINIC RESEARCH FUND (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.00k | £0 | £0 | £1.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 MARCH 1999
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE MEDICAL EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROMOTE RESEARCH IN THE FIELD OF GASTROENTEROLOGY AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH (B) TO ACQUIRE AND DISSEMINATE INFORMATION WITH REGARD TO GASTROENTEROLOGY (C) TO INITIATE CO-ORDINATE AND GIVE ADVICE ON RESEARCH PROJECTS IN THE FIELD OF GASTROENTEROLOGY UNDERTAKEN FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC (D) TO SPONSOR AND ARRANGE LECTURES CONFERENCES EXHIBITIONS AND STUDY PROGRAMMES ON GASTROENTEROLOGY AND OTHER RELATED SUBJECTS (E) TO ADVANCE MEDICAL EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN ANY OTHER FIELDS OF MEDICINE (F) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window