Accounts and annual returns THE BROMSGROVE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity number: 1077135
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 02 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 July 2024 269 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required