THE BROMSGROVE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public and in particular the education of the middle aged and older people who are not in full-time gainful employment in Bromsgrove and its surrounding locality. The provision of facilities for leisure time and recreational activities with the object of improving the conditions of life for the above persons in the interests of their social welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 24 August 1999: Standard registration
- THE BROMSGROVE U3A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Rainbow | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Professor Geoffrey Keynton Morse | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Karen Le Marchand | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Demeris Prichard | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthea Margaret Whitehead | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Irene Joyce Collett | Trustee | 17 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Judith Flora Leslie | Trustee | 17 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Byrne | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.40k | £1.81k | £10.99k | £12.94k | £16.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.58k | £2.10k | £10.34k | £12.56k | £14.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2024 | 269 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
REVISED CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 JULY 1999, AS AMENDED ON THE 17TH MARCH 2005
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF MIDDLE AGED AND OLDER PEOPLE WHO ARE NOT IN FULL-TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT IN BROMSGROVE AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY 2) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE-TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE
Area of benefit
BROMSGROVE
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Westhill Road
BIRMINGHAM
B38 8TL
- Phone:
- 07980129971
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window