Trustees THE BROMSGROVE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1077135

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Rainbow | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Professor Geoffrey Keynton Morse | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Karen Le Marchand | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Demeris Prichard | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthea Margaret Whitehead | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Irene Joyce Collett | Trustee | 17 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Judith Flora Leslie | Trustee | 17 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Byrne | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.