Accounts and annual returns THE DORCHESTER AND DISTRICT U3A

Charity number: 1077305
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 25 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 25 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 11 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required