THE DORCHESTER AND DISTRICT U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running Courses and Activities for older people in the Dorchester Area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Dorset
Governance
- 07 September 1999: Standard registration
- U.3.A. DORCHESTER/WEYMOUTH (Working name)
- UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE DORCHESTER/WEYMOUTH (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Roy Hopwood | Chair | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Jane Chappell | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Geoffrey Howes | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Ann Winder | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Penny Doubleday | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Myles Provis | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christina Eury Andrews | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Marilyn Langthorne | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Jane Hopwood | Trustee | 05 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Jane Huff | Trustee | 10 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETER SCAIFE | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS HUGH MAITLAND PRIDDLE | Trustee | 24 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
LESLIE MOULD | Trustee | 16 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.06k | £12.52k | £13.44k | £27.44k | £42.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.51k | £6.23k | £17.40k | £26.62k | £25.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £800 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 JULY 1999 AS AMENDED 14 DECEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
DORCHESTER, WEYMOUTH AND SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Park Farm
Martinstown
DORCHESTER
Dorset
DT2 9JN
- Phone:
- 01305889189
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window